Davies, Donald James (CPSO#: 73740)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Murray St PO Box 1630
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone: (705) 647-4102
Fax: (705) 647-0114
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD JAMES DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 17 Jan 2011
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999