Davies, Simon Jonathan Cheshire (CPSO#: 97365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Mar 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Geriatric Mental Health Program
PACE Clinic
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 33448
Fax: (416) 583-1296
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Sep 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Simon Jonathan Cheshire Davies may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Psychiatry, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Davies holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Davies no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.