Davies, Timothy Owen (CPSO#: 77744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
B3 Surgical Offices
Room 147
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 42820
Fax: (905) 381-7037
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Randhawa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Randhawa ( CPSO# 74322 )
Dr. T. Davies ( CPSO# 77744 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
155 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A4
Phone Number: (289) 389-8900


Corporation Name: T. Davies Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Randhawa ( CPSO# 74322 )
Dr. T. Davies ( CPSO# 77744 )
Dr. A. Davies ( CPSO# 23646 )

Business Address:
Henderson Hospital
Section B3 Room 147
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY OWEN DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2009