Davis, Alison Jean (CPSO#: 73044)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of New South Wales, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 22 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2000