Davis, Jennifer Leigh (CPSO#: 77584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rugged Shores Family Health Team
60 Bowes Street Unit 101
Parry Sound ON  P2A 2L3
Phone: (705) 746-2181
Fax: 705-746-4753
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEIGH DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2012