Davis-Faroque, Nicole (CPSO#: 93260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction& Mental Health
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: 416-979-6882
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole Davis-Faroque Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Davis-Faroque ( CPSO# 93260 )

Business Address:
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE DAVIS-FAROQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS-FAROQUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2016