Davison, Peter Diarmuid (CPSO#: 27636)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 May 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
3328 McCarthy Rd
Ottawa ON  K1V 9X5
Phone: (613) 738-1564
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Davison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 18 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 01 May 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 02 May 2018
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 02 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 01 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from 3:00 p.m., May 1, 2018, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following term, condition
            and limitation is imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter
            Diarmuid Davison:

                  Dr. Davison will successfully complete one on one instructions in medical
                  ethics with an instructor approved by the College, at his own expense,
                  within six months of the date of this Order, and shall provide proof of
                  completion to the College.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 May 2018
Summary:

On May 1, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Peter Diarmuid Davison committed an 
act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant 
to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all of the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as unprofessional.  
 
Dr. Davison is a family physician practising in Ottawa. He received his certificate of registration 
authorizing independent practice from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario in 
1975. 
 
Patient A 
 
Patient A, a man in his 90s, has been a patient of Dr. Davison since mid-1990s. Dr. Davison has 
followed Patient A for his general primary care needs, including with respect to hypertension, 
osteoarthritis, coronary artery disease, B12injections, respiratory concerns, situational mood 
issues related to the passing of his family member and ongoing sleep issues.  
 
In 2015, a general evaluation was conducted of Patient A at the Hospital by a geriatric nurse. The 
outcome of the evaluation was “suspected dementia” and “probable mixed mild dementia”. 
Following this, Dr. Davison completed an assessment for Patient A in support of his application 
for admission into a long-term care home and completed an Ontario Pharmacist Association 
Notification Form in April 2016, which was provided in support of a more frequent medication 
dispensing interval for Patient A. Dr. Davison described that Patient A “forgets to take his 
medications” and is late for refills “up to 1 month sometimes”.  
 
In July of 2016, Dr. Davison was experiencing acute financial difficulties, both of a professional 
and personal nature, including with respect to paying office rent. He turned to a close friend for 
help, who was unable to provide him with financial assistance. He petitioned his office landlord 
to come to a workable solution and the landlord partially agreed, but some funds were still 
needed in order to get back into the office. Given his age and stage of career, he was also deeply 
embarrassed by the circumstances. Aside from his wife and close friend, he did not share details 
of his financial difficulties with other family members, including his children, nor did he seek 
support from additional friends or family. 
     
Dr. Davison visited Patient A at his condominium, where he lives alone, and requested financial 
assistance from Patient A. No-one besides Dr. Davison and Patient A was present for this 
discussion. Patient A agreed and provided a cheque for $10,000 to Dr. Davison. Dr. Davison 
indicated he would return the money once he was in a position to do so and cashed Patient A’s 
cheque on July 28, 2016. In August 2016, Dr. Davison attended at Patient A’s condominium 
again to advise that he was not yet in a position to return the money. He expected to receive a 
payment from OHIP in mid-August which had not yet arrived as expected. No-one besides Dr. 
Davison and Patient A was present for this discussion. 
     
The College received a complaint about Dr. Davison on September 1, 2016 from a close friend 
of Patient A, Ms. B. Dr. Davison was verbally notified of the complaint on September 12, 2016 
and in writing on September 19, 2016. On September 20, 2016 Dr. Davison received a payment 
from OHIP. That same day, Dr. Davison provided a cheque, dated September 20, 2016 to Patient 
A in the amount of $10,000, together with a thank you card. The cheque was cashed on 
September 22, 2016. 
     
In November of 2016 College Investigator spoke with Patient A, who indicated that Dr. Davison 
had repaid him and that he had deposited the cheque. When the Investigator requested 
confirmation that the cheque was deposited, Patient A responded that as far as he was concerned 
the matter was closed.  
     
In his response to the College, dated October 31, 2016, Dr. Davison indicated that the decision to 
approach Patient A was made while he was under a considerable amount of stress, which he 
acknowledged and understood was misguided. While he believed at the time that he and Patient 
A were on equal footing and that Patient A was not a vulnerable person, he appreciated that he 
put Patient A in a difficult position and he apologized to Patient A. 
     
The College commenced investigation on March 12, 2017. Dr. Davison cooperated with the 
College’s investigation.  He has no prior history of any discipline proceeding. 
 
Disposition 
 
On May 1, 2018, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-  The Registrar suspend Dr. Davison’s certificate of registration for a three month period, to 
   commence at 12:01 a.m. on May 2, 2018. 
-  The Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Davison’s 
   Certificate of Registration: Dr. Davison will successfully complete one on one instructions 
   in medical ethics with an instructor approved by the College, at his own expense, within six 
   months of the date of this Order, and shall provide proof of completion to the College. 
-  Dr. Davison appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Davison pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $5,500 within 
   thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 1, 2018, start time 1:00 p.m.