Davoudi, Soraya (CPSO#: 76269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Emergency Medicine
Room 1103
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 79002
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Soraya Davoudi Medecine Societe Professionnelle / Soraya Davoudi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Davoudi ( CPSO# 76269 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1103 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 795-5555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SORAYA DAVOUDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVOUDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006