Dawodu, Oseluese Anastasia (CPSO#: 85649)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Benin, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 18 Dec 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 24 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2007