Dawood, Shamim (CPSO#: 89945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MATTHEWS GATE MEDICAL CLINIC
UNIT# 4
3662 HURONTARIO STREET
Mississauga ON  L5B 1P3
Phone: 905 232 3600
Fax: (905) 232 2900
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Dawood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dawood ( CPSO# 89945 )

Business Address:
Matthews Gate Medical Clinic
Unit 4
3662 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 232-3600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAMIM DAWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 18 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011