Dawson, Jeffrey Allan (CPSO#: 90777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lennox and Addington County General
8 Richmond Park Dr
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone: 613 354-3301
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Dawson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dawson ( CPSO# 90777 )

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 654-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY ALLAN DAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2011