Dawson, Katharine Lynne (CPSO#: 81008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: 7057593434
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Dawson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 15 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHARINE LYNNE DAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006