Day, Andrew Stewart (CPSO#: 71710)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Otago, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2000