Daya, Salim Haiderali (CPSO#: 31386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Feb 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Kachchi

Education:University of Manchester, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Newlife Fertility Centre
4250 Sherwoodtowne Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L4Z 2G6
Phone: (905) 896-7100 Ext. 131
Fax: (905) 896-7200
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

NewLife Fertility Centre
Unit 210
2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 0X5
Canada
Phone: (905) 896-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Newlife Fertility Centre
670 Highway 7
Unit 8
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P2
Canada
Phone: 905 886 7300
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Newlife Fertility Centre
7777 Kipling Ave
Unit 103
Vaughan ON  L4L 2Z3
Canada
Phone: 905 264 4431
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Salim Daya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Daya ( CPSO# 31386 )

Business Address:
Newlife Fertility Centre
4250 Sherwoodtowne Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L4Z 2G6
Phone Number: (905) 896-7100

Business Address:
210 - 2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 0X5

Business Address:
103 - 7777 Kipling Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 2Z3

Business Address:
8 - 670 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 20 Feb 2006

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 20 Feb 2006 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 20, 2006, Dr. Salim Haiderali Daya undertakes to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario the following:

                  1.    (a)   I will not perform the Tompkins Metroplasty procedure;
                  
                        (b)   Prior to performing any other type of metroplasty, I will
                              obtain a second opinion, in writing, from a specialist
                              acceptable to the College that a metroplasty is indicated,
                              and that the metroplasty procedure that I propose to perform
                              is the appropriate one in the circumstances; and
                  
                        (c)   I intend to resume a gynaecology surgical practice and there
                              has been no recent assessment of my surgical skills.  Prior
                              to performing any unsupervised surgical procedures, I will
                              advise the College of my intention to do so and undergo an
                              evaluation and, if necessary on the basis of the evaluation,
                              training acceptable to the College.  I will ensure that the
                              most responsible physician is acceptable to the College.
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)