Dayal, Anita Mary (CPSO#: 95691)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Oak Medical
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 200
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: 905-582-7533
Fax: 905-582-0766
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 15 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA MARY DAYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAYAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 08 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2017