De, Aloke (CPSO#: 92481)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aloke De Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 11 2016

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record may call Active Care Carlingwood at: 613-761-6777, or fax: 613-761-7744.
Date Received: 14 Sep 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018