De Benedetti, Monica Catherine (CPSO#: 73669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 212
15 Mountain Avenue South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V6
Phone: (905) 662-4646
Fax: (905) 662-5429
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA CATHERINE DE BENEDETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE BENEDETTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2004