De Jager, Peter Salomon Christopher (CPSO#: 96827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Oct 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5649
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter S.C. De Jager Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. De Jager ( CPSO# 96827 )
Dr. T. O'Brien ( CPSO# 108902)

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5649

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 01 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Apr 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Peter  Salomon Christopher De Jager may practice medicine independently in
            Emergency Medicine, only.