De La Ronde, Sandra Kathleen (CPSO#: 50418)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request to the following address: Wabano Centre for Aboriginal Health 299 Montreal Road Ottawa ON K1L 6B8
Date Received: 24 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018