De Ladurantaye, Alain (CPSO#: 74398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CISSS de l'Abitibi-Témiscamingue
Pavillon Ville-Marie
22 rue Notre-Dame Nord
Ville-Marie
Ville-Marie QC  J9V 1W8
Phone: 819-629-2420
Fax: 819-629-3257

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAIN DE LADURANTAYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE LADURANTAYE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 15 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2011