De Maria, Christine (CPSO#: 95787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Deep River District Hospital
117 Banting Dr
Deep River ON  K0J 1P0
Canada
Phone: (613) 584-3333
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Clinique médicale Asclepios
570 Lacolle way
Ottawa ON  K4A 0N9
Canada
Phone: (613) 830-8388
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine De Maria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. De Maria ( CPSO# 95787 )

Business Address:
Asclepios Clinic
570 Lacolle Way
Ottawa ON  K4A 0N9
Phone Number: (613) 830-8388

Business Address:
117 Banting Drive
Deep River ON  K0J 1P0
Phone Number: (613) 584-3333

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Aug 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE DE MARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE MARIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2014