De Mercado, Robert Bruce (CPSO#: 30170)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1978
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 19 May 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Oct 1980
Summary:

 In October 1980, the Discipline Committee found Dr. De Mercado guilty of professional misconduct, 
 as defined in Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with 
 a patient, contrary to s. 26(28); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 26(31).  The Committee 
 further found Dr. De Mercado guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the 
 Health Disciplines Act, 1974, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant 
 to his suitability to practice.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. De Mercado(s licence 
 to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 27 Apr 1981
Hearing Date(s): Oct 20, 1980

Application for Reinstatement  
Decision Date: 17 Jan 1985
Decision: Application Accepted