De Souza, Darina Marie (CPSO#: 81772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
Halton Healthcare
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.M. de Souza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2014


Corporation Name: Dr. Darina M. De Souza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. De Souza ( CPSO# 81772 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Halton Health Care
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Apr 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARINA MARIE DE SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE SOUZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2004 to 27 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 28 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2006