DeAngelis, Matthew Anthony (CPSO#: 83222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
117 Centrepointe Drive Unit #205
Ottawa ON  K2G-5X3
Phone: (613) 695-5334
Fax: (613) 695-5336
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew DeAngelis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. DeAngelis ( CPSO# 83222 )

Business Address:
205 - 117 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X3
Phone Number: (613) 695-5334

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW ANTHONY DEANGELIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEANGELIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2008