DeLuca, Terry Kenneth (CPSO#: 96712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Harrow Family Health Center Inc
1480 Erie Road South
PO Box 430
Harrow ON  N0R 1G0
Phone: (519) 738-2000
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Leamington District Memorial
Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

7875 Riverside Drive East
Windsor ON  N8S 1E1
Canada
Phone: 5199744122
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRY KENNETH DELUCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELUCA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2013