DeLyzer, Tanya Lynn (CPSO#: 90554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC - Victoria Campus
Room E2-648
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58108
Fax: (519) 685-8114
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luc Dubois Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Dubois ( CPSO# 82478 )
Dr. T. DeLyzer ( CPSO# 90554 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Room E2 117
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8161

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Room E2 - 648
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 19 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANYA LYNN DELYZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELYZER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 13 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2014 to 18 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015