DeSouza, Minella Francisca (CPSO#: 73470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
87b Harbord Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1G4
Phone: (647) 748-4111
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Minella DeSouza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. DeSouza ( CPSO# 73470 )

Business Address:
87B Harbord Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1G4
Phone Number: (647) 748-4111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Apr 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MINELLA FRANCISCA DESOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESOUZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2005