Deane, Leslie Allan (CPSO#: 75562)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 01 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2001 to 01 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2002 to 01 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005