Death, Arthur Barry (CPSO#: 21469)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Dec 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 1982

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 02-120
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0R7
Phone: (519) 685-4813
Fax: (519) 439-5556
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.B. Death Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Death ( CPSO# 21469 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Hospital
550 Wellington Road
Room 02 - 120
London ON  N6C 0R7
Phone Number: (519) 683-4813

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARTHUR BARRY DEATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEATH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jan 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1982

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)