Deaton, Shoshanah Eliane Charlotte (CPSO#: 82658)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2741 Chamberland
Rockland ON  K4K 0B4
Phone: (613) 446-7677
Fax: (613) 446-5737
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deaton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Deaton ( CPSO# 82658 )

Business Address:
2741 Chamberland Street
Rockland ON  K4K 0B4
Phone Number: (613) 446-7677

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jan 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHOSHANAH ELIANE CHARLOTTE DEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEATON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2007 to 14 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2008