Debicki, Derek Brian (CPSO#: 90545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room C7-131
339 Windermere Road
P.O. Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-663-3229
Fax: 519-663-3237
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Debicki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Debicki ( CPSO# 90545 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital-Division of Neurology
Room C7-131
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3229

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK BRIAN DEBICKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEBICKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015