Deboer-Fennell, Heidi Lauren (CPSO#: 95742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Deboer, Heidi Lauren (used until: 13 Aug 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201, 190 Cundles Rd East
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone: (705) 721-0547
Fax: (705) 727-4056
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Regional Health Cent
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M6M2
Canada
Phone: 705-728-9090
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deboer-Fennell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Deboer-Fennell ( CPSO# 95742 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
190 Cundles Road East
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone Number: (705) 721-0547

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEIDI LAUREN DEBOER-FENNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEBOER-FENNELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013