Debretsion, Tadese Fesehaye (CPSO#: 91948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English, Tigrigna

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1111 ALBION ROAD
SIUTE G7
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1A9
Phone: 416 749 9400
Fax: 416 749 6880
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TADESE FESEHAYE DEBRETSION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEBRETSION is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2011