Deen, Hurara (CPSO#: 89741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: Khursheed, Abuhurara (used until: 22 Nov 2011 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad Techologica De Santiago, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
51 James Snow Parkway Clinic
Milton ON  L9E 0H1
Phone: 905-636-1050
Fax: 905-636-1090
Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact 289-400-2626
Date Received: 04 Nov 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HURARA DEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2008 to 08 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 09 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 25 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2017