Deeth, Karen Lyn (CPSO#: 84274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Lyn Deeth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Deeth ( CPSO# 84274 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN LYN DEETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEETH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008