Dehghani, Payam (CPSO#: 73534)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 26 Aug 2005
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Aug 2011