Dehghani, Payman (CPSO#: 91114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3111
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health Center
2100 Bovaird Dr. E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Payman Dehghani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dehghani ( CPSO# 91114 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1J6
Phone Number: (416) 340-3111

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 454-2120

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2S8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAYMAN DEHGHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEHGHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Dec 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2011