Dekna, Maisa Mohamed Amer (CPSO#: 88257)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare Services
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
Department of Pediatrics
3001 Hospital gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 4167158259
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maisa Dekna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dekna ( CPSO# 88257 )
Dr. S. Huwedi Abouanaser ( CPSO# 87919 )

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare Services
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
302 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 523-7920

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Huwedi Abouanaser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dekna ( CPSO# 88257 )
Dr. S. Huwedi Abouanaser ( CPSO# 87919 )

Business Address:
4-780 Burnhamthorp Road West
Mississauga ON  L5C 3X3
Phone Number: (905) 897-9000

Business Address:
424 Luke Wing
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAISA MOHAMED AMER DEKNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEKNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2008 to 10 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 11 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 31 Aug 2010 to 30 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 31 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2012