Del Sorbo, Lorenzo (CPSO#: 80984)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2016

Expiry Date:  21 Aug 2023

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Turin, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Critical Care Medicine - ICU
11Pmb-122
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3601
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lorenzo Del Sorbo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Del Sorbo ( CPSO# 80984 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Critical Care Medicine ICU
11PMB-122
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-3601

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 22 Aug 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2015 to 18 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Aug 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Lorenzo Del Sorbo may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Respirology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Del
                        Sorbo holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Del Sorbo  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Del Sorbo's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Del Sorbo's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on August 22, 2016.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on August 21, 2023.