Deleon-Matsuda, Maria L (CPSO#: 90470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of the Philippines, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Woodlands Medical Centre
Suite 204
40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone: (519) 759-6116
Fax: (519) 759-7727
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maria L. Deleon-Matsuda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Deleon-Matsuda ( CPSO# 90470 )

Business Address:
North Woodlands Medical Centre
Suite 204
40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone Number: (519) 759-6116

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA L DELEON-MATSUDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELEON-MATSUDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2011