Demarco, Stephanie Anne (CPSO#: 92185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: Cairns, Stephanie Anne (used until: 12 Jul 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
104-180 Vine St. South
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone: 1-905-685-1200
Fax: 905-685-1600
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ANNE DEMARCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMARCO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2010 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2010 to 19 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2012