Demarco, Vincent Paul (CPSO#: 28330)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2006
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 02 Jul 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012