Demers, Brigitte (CPSO#: 58410)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 02 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2005