Demong, Paige Manyi (CPSO#: 80740)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2009