Denardi, Franco Graziano (CPSO#: 53051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Nov 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
32 Camp Dr.
Ancaster ON  L9K 0A6
Phone: (905)541-7088
Fax: (905) 648-0055
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Ave 3rd floor
St. Catharines site
Laboratory Medicine
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 905-378-4647 Ext. 46518
Fax: 905-984-5578
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.F. Denardi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Denardi ( CPSO# 53051 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
St Catharines Site
Laboratory Medicine
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 31 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCO GRAZIANO DENARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENARDI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1989