Denkers, Matthew Robert (CPSO#: 79247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5Th Floor
Room 531
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2S2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 577-8248
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Denkers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sutherland ( CPSO# 74909 )
Dr. M. Denkers ( CPSO# 79247 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site, McMaster Clinic
237 Barton Street East 5th Floor North
Room 531
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Suite 506
3027 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3G7
Phone Number: (905) 333-5100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW ROBERT DENKERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENKERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2009