Dennie, Carole J. (CPSO#: 55436)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
The Ottawa Hospital (Civic Campus)
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 696-7000 Ext. 4164
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mississippi Mills
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

350 John Street Nort
Arnprior ON  K7S 2B6
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

499 Raglan St N
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

566 Louise St
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

7 St Francis Memorial Dr
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fraser Rubens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rubens ( CPSO# 55799 )
Dr. C. Dennie ( CPSO# 55436 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Business Address:
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Room H3401A
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4720


Corporation Name: Dr. Carole Dennie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rubens ( CPSO# 55799 )
Dr. C. Dennie ( CPSO# 55436 )

Business Address:
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4164

Business Address:
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4164

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLE J. DENNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENNIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1987