Dent, Rebecca Alexandra (CPSO#: 74919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
National Cancer Center Singapore
11 Hospital Drive
Singapore 169610
Singapore
Phone: (656) 436-8000
Fax: (656) 227-2759

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Singapore

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA ALEXANDRA DENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2004