Deol, Mandeep Kaur (CPSO#: 95301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Arbour Family Medical Centre
281 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 5J5
Phone: (519) 823-5133
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mandeep Deol Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. DEOL ( CPSO# 95301 )

Business Address:
Arbour Family Medical Centre
281 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 5J5
Phone Number: (519) 823-5133

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANDEEP KAUR DEOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEOL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2014