Deonarain, Sue (CPSO#: 92389)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2011
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017